VA SB44 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia State Bar admission for full-time law school professors. Allows a full-time law professor to be admitted as an active member of the Virginia State Bar without examination provided that (i) he has been engaged in the full-time practice of law for five of the seven years immediately preceding application for membership to the Virginia State Bar; (ii) he is employed as a full-time professor at an American Bar Association accredited Virginia law school; and (iii) he meets all other requirements for admission to the Virginia State Bar. The bill provides that membership is limited to the period of employment as a full-time professor.
Title
Virginia State Bar; allows full-time law school professors to be admitted as an active member.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) | |
2012-01-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-03 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100607D |