VA SB437 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Child day programs; radon testing. Requires regulated child day programs that are located in jurisdictions designated by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency as High or Moderate Risk areas for indoor radon to test for radon at least once every five years, submit the results to the Department of Social Services, and make the results available to the public. The bill provides that if indoor radon levels are 4.0 pCi/L or higher, the regulated child day program shall consider mitigation by a professional. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2015.
Title
Child day programs; radon testing shall be conducted between Nov. & Mar. in lowest area of building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB437S1 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104421D-S1 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104421D-S1 |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102242D |