VA SB433 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Use of constitutional rights in a civil case. Repeals the provision that, in any civil case, a party who exercises his constitutional rights cannot have such exercise used against him.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil cases; use of constitutional rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB433S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106931D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N)
2020-02-10SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106931D-S1
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100956D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182365(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback