VA SB431 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Letter sent to the Department of Health Professions
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Provision of mental health services to a minor; access to health records. Prohibits a health care provider from refusing to provide mental health services to a minor on the basis that the parents of such minor refuse to agree to limit their access to such minor's health care records or request that such health care provider testify in a court proceeding regarding the treatment of the minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provision of mental health services to a minor; access to health records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-08SenateLetter sent to the Department of Health Professions
2020-01-23SenatePassed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100739D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412915(n/a)See Bill Text
5413506.2(n/a)See Bill Text
5413617(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback