VA SB427 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; employment services organizations. Includes employment services organizations in the development and operation of any state procurement program or program goals and targets for small, women-owned, and minority-owned businesses.
Title
Small Business and Supplier Diversity, Department of; employment services organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB427S1 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 14104835D-S1 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 14104835D-S1 (Hanger) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101876D |