VA SB427 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Information Technologies Agency; internal service funds. Establishes the Information Technology and Management Internal Service Fund for the Virginia Information Technologies Agency. The newly established fund will replace the three internal service funds currently administered by VITA. The bill also authorizes the Comptroller to establish, upon the request of the Chief Information Officer of the Commonwealth and the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission, other internal service fund accounts for receipts and expenditures of appropriate functions of VITA.
Title
Information Technology and Management Internal Service Fund; established for VITA.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285) | |
2012-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 285 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB427ER) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-22 | House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Science and Technology | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101865D |
Same As/Similar To
HB620 (Same As) 2012-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0055)