VA SB416 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limited Residential Lodging Act; penalty. Establishes the Limited Residential Lodging Act (the Act), which allows persons to rent out their primary residences or portions thereof for charge for periods of less than 30 consecutive days or do so through a hosting platform. Localities are preempted from adopting ordinances or zoning restriction prohibiting such short-term rentals, but authorized to adopt ordinances requiring persons renting their primary residences to have a minimum of $500,000 of liability insurance, prohibiting persons from renting their primary residences if they fail to pay applicable taxes, and requiring persons renting their primary residences to register with the locality. A hosting platform must register with the Department of Taxation to collect and remit all applicable taxes on behalf of the property owner using the hosting platform. The bill defines "limited residential lodging," "booking transaction," and "hosting platform" and provides for penalties for violations of the Act. The bill contains a reenactment clause and directs the Virginia Housing Commission to convene a work group to further study the issues presented in the bill and make recommendations for consideration by the 2017 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Limited Residential Lodging Act; established, penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N 1-A) (Y: 93 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments #1, #2 by Senator Norment rejected (17-Y 22-N) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (7-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N 1-A) (Y: 93 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments #1, #2 by Senator Norment rejected (17-Y 22-N) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (7-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 674 (effective - see bill) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB416ER) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Title replaced 16105975D-H1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N 1-A) |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed House with substitute (90-Y 8-N 1-A) |
2016-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB416H1 |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105975D-H1 |
2016-03-02 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105975D-H1 |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB416S2 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Amendment #3 by Senator Norment withdrawn |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Amendments #1, #2 by Senator Norment rejected (17-Y 22-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reading of amendments #1, #2 waived |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105548D-S2 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 16104701D-S1 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105548D-S2 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (7-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104701D-S1 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to General Laws and Technology |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101163D |