VA SB416 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Family Access to Medical Insurance Security Plan; eligibility. Eliminates the requirement that an individual under the age of 19 must have been without health insurance for at least four months or must meet the requirements set forth in the Virginia Plan for Title XXI of the Social Security Act (Children's Health Insurance Program) to be eligible for assistance under the Family Access to Medical Insurance Security Plan. The bill requires regulations to be promulgated within 280 days of enactment and is identical to
Title
Family Access to Medical Insurance Security Plan; eligibility for assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183) | |
2014-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 183 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB416ER) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-19 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-02-17 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-13 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (19-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101249D |