VA SB415 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing; licensure exemption. Exempts from licensure any nurse who holds a current unrestricted license in another state, the District of Columbia, or a United States possession or territory while such nurse is in the Commonwealth temporarily and is practicing nursing in a summer camp or in conjunction with clients who are participating in specified recreational or educational activities.
Title
Nurses; licensure exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117) | |
2012-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 117 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB415ER) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-20 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2012-02-20 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12103941D-E | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB415E | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103941D |
Same As/Similar To
HB885 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0178)