VA SB41 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Religious freedom; solemnization of marriage. Provides that no person shall be (i) required to participate in the solemnization of any marriage or (ii) subject to any penalty, any civil liability, or any other action by the Commonwealth, or its political subdivisions or representatives or agents, solely on account of such person's belief, speech, or action in accordance with a sincerely held religious belief or moral conviction that marriage is or should be recognized as the union of one man and one woman. The bill defines "person" as any (a) religious organization, (b) organization supervised or controlled by or operated in connection with a religious organization, (c) individual employed by a religious organization while acting in the scope of his paid or volunteer employment, (d) successor, representative, agent, agency, or instrumentality of any of the foregoing, or (e) clergy member or minister. The bill also defines "penalty."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Religious freedom; marriage solemnization, participation, and beliefs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Ruling of Chair Not Sustained (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment agreed to (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20SenateRequires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
2016-04-20SenateMotion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 18-N)
2016-03-30 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2016-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/16/16
2016-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-11SenateSigned by President
2016-03-11SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB41ER)
2016-03-11SenateEnrolled
2016-03-10SenateTitle replaced 16105987D-H1
2016-03-10SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2016-03-10SenateReconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2016-03-10SenateChair votes No
2016-03-10SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
2016-03-09HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 38-N)
2016-03-09HousePassed House with substitute (59-Y 38-N)
2016-03-09HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB41H1
2016-03-09HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 16105987D-H1
2016-03-09HouseRead third time
2016-03-08HousePassed by for the day
2016-03-07HouseRead second time
2016-03-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 16105987D-H1
2016-03-03HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
2016-02-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2016-02-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2016-02-17HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2016-02-17HouseRead first time
2016-02-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-12SenatePassed Senate (20-Y 19-N)
2016-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2016-02-12SenatePrinted as reengrossed 16101522D-E2
2016-02-12SenateReengrossed by Senate as amended SB41E
2016-02-12SenateRuling of Chair Not Sustained - (19-Y 20-N)
2016-02-12SenateAmendments by Senator Ebbin-Chair ruled germane
2016-02-12SenateReading of amendments waived
2016-02-12SenatePassed by temporarily
2016-02-12SenateSubstitute by Senator Ebbin out of order 16105551D-S1
2016-02-12SenateCommittee amendment agreed to (20-Y 19-N)
2016-02-12SenateCommittee amendment reconsidered (25-Y 14-N)
2016-02-12SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (28-Y 11-N)
2016-02-12SenateFloor substitute printed to Web only 16105515D-S1 (Ebbin)
2016-02-12SenatePassed by temporarily
2016-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 16101522D-E
2016-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB41E
2016-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2016-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2016-02-11SenateRead second time
2016-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2016-02-08SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (8-Y 7-N)
2015-12-15SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2015-12-15SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101522D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+SB41
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB41+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB41E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB41S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB41E2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB41H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB41ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S12V0051+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0313SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0363SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0364SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0365SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0374SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0375SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0376SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H1104V0053+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H11V0256+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1283+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1006SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1007SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1008SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1135SB0041+SB0041

Bill Comments

feedback