VA SB4024 | 2019 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting sale, transport, etc., of assault firearms, Prohibiting sale, transport, etc., of assault firearms, certain firearm magazines, trigger activators, and silencers; penalties. Expands the definition of "assault firearm" and prohibits any person from importing, selling, transferring, manufacturing, purchasing, possessing, or transporting an assault firearm. A violation is a Class 6 felony. The bill prohibits a dealer from selling, renting, trading, or transferring from his inventory an assault firearm to any person. The bill also prohibits a person from carrying a shotgun with a magazine that will hold more than seven rounds of the longest ammunition for which it is chambered in a public place; under existing law, this prohibition applies only in certain localities. The bill makes it a Class 6 felony to import, sell, transfer, manufacture, purchase, possess, or transport large-capacity firearm magazines, silencers, and trigger activators, all defined in the bill. Any person who legally owns an assault firearm, large-capacity firearm magazine, silencer, or trigger activator on November 1, 2019, may retain possession until July 1, 2020. During that time, such person shall (i) render the assault firearm, large-capacity firearm magazine, silencer, or trigger activator inoperable; (ii) remove the assault firearm, large-capacity firearm magazine, silencer, or trigger activator from the Commonwealth; (iii) transfer the assault firearm, large-capacity firearm magazine, silencer, or trigger activator to a person outside the Commonwealth who is not prohibited from possessing it; or (iv) surrender the assault firearm, large-capacity firearm magazine, silencer, or trigger activator to a state or local law-enforcement agency. The bill establishes an appropriation for the fiscal impact of the bill and authorizes the Director of the Department of Planning and Budget to allocate such appropriation among

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault firearms, certain firearm magazines, trigger activators, & silencers; prohibiting sale, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenatePassed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (9-Y 6-N)
2019-07-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-07-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 07/09/19 19200274D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161278.9(n/a)See Bill Text
182287.4(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.12(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:01(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.7(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.8(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.9(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.28(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback