VA SB400 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Corporation Commission; clerk's fees. Authorizes the State Corporation Commission to establish the amount of the fees to be charged by the clerk of the Commission for furnishing copies of documents, certifying information, and providing access to records in the clerk's office. The fees shall be reasonable and are to be established by order or rule of the Commission. Existing provisions that establish specific fees for furnishing copies of documents, searching records, and affixing the Commission's seal are repealed.
Title
State Corporation Commission; authorized to establish fees for furnishing copies of documents, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669) | |
2010-04-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 669 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB400ER) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-23 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101168D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 1 | 21.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 1 | 21.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |