VA SB4 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public School Assistance Fund and Program created. Creates the Public School Assistance Fund and Program, to be administered by the Department of Education, for the purpose of providing grants to school boards to be used solely for the purpose of repairing or replacing the roofs of public elementary and secondary school buildings in the local school division. The bill permits any school board in the Commonwealth to apply for Program grants but requires the Department of Education to give priority in the award of grants to school boards that demonstrate the greatest need based on the condition of existing school building roofs and the ability to pay for the repair or replacement of such roofs. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Public School Assistance Fund and Program; created.
Sponsors
Sen. William Stanley [R] | Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] |
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment agreed to (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment agreed to (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20100382D-E |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB4E |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Floor substitute ruled out of order 20107924D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to (24-Y 15-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20107924D-S1 (Stanley) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100382D |