VA SB395 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Roanoke Higher Education Authority; board of trustees; membership. Adds the president of Virginia State University or his designee to the board of trustees of the Roanoke Higher Education Authority and removes the presidents of Averett University and Mary Baldwin College or their designees from the board of trustees.
Title
Roanoke Higher Education Authority; board of trustees, membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 611 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB395ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-07 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103774D |
Subjects
Authorities
Averett University
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Mary Baldwin College
Virginia State University
Averett University
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Mary Baldwin College
Virginia State University