VA SB39 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Kinship foster care; alternative living arrangements; Parental Child Safety Placement Program established. Establishes the Parental Child Safety Placement Program to promote and support placements of children with relatives by local boards of social services in order to avoid foster care. The bill establishes the requirements for a parental child safety placement agreement, the procedure for assessing a proposed caregiver, and the process for terminating the placement.
Title
Kinship foster care; placement of child with foster parent.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Sen. Ryan McDougle [R] | Sen. Mark Obenshain [R] |
Sen. Chris Head [R] | Sen. Angelia Williams Graves [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 662 (effective - see bill) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB39ER) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB39S1 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24105803D-S1 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Incorporates SB467 (Obenshain) |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Incorporates SB162 (McDougle) |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24105803D-S1 |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101422D |
Same As/Similar To
HB27 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)