VA SB389 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Substance-exposed infants; plan for services; report. Provides that the Department of Health (the Department) shall serve as the lead agency with responsibility for the development, coordination, and implementation of a plan for services for substance-exposed infants in the Commonwealth. Such plan shall (i) support a trauma-informed approach to identification and treatment of substance-exposed infants and their caregivers and (ii) include (a) options for improving screening and identification of substance-using pregnant women, (b) use of multidisciplinary approaches to intervention and service delivery during the prenatal period and following the birth of the substance-exposed child, and (c) referral among providers serving substance-exposed infants and their families and caregivers. The bill requires the Department to report annually to the General Assembly regarding implementation of the plan. This bill is identical to HB 1157.
Title
Substance-exposed infants; plan for services, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 696 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB389ER) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-02-27 | House | Delegates: Pillion, Orrock, Aird |
2018-02-27 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Chafin, Dunnavant, Barker |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | House requested conference committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House insisted on amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed bill reprinted 18102847D-E |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18102847D-E |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB389E |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee amendment from Finance agreed to |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee amendments from Education and Health agreed to |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102847D |