VA SB384 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Sports betting; Problem Gambling Treatment and Support Fund; penalties. Directs the Virginia Lottery (the Lottery) to regulate sports betting. The bill prohibits the Lottery from issuing any permits to conduct sports betting until it has developed and published a consumer protection bill of rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Lottery; powers and duties of Board, sports betting, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 34-N) (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N) (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator McPike agreed to (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB384ER)
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 8-N)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (58-Y 34-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (58-Y 34-N)
2020-03-08SenateSenators: McPike, Mason, Pillion
2020-03-08SenateSecond conferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-07SenateSecond Conference substitute printed 20109887D-S5
2020-03-07HouseDelegates: Sickles, Simon, Morefield
2020-03-07HouseSecond conferees appointed by House
2020-03-07HouseHouse acceded to request for second conference committee
2020-03-07SenateSenate requested second conference committee (32-Y 7-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2020-03-07SenateFirst Conference substitute printed 20109655D-S4
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-02-26HouseDelegates: Sickles, Simon, Morefield
2020-02-26HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-26SenateSenators: McPike, Mason, Pillion
2020-02-26SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-26SenateSenate acceded to request (36-Y 3-N)
2020-02-26HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-25SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N)
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House with substitute (59-Y 38-N)
2020-02-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB384H1
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108617D-H1
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108617D-H1
2020-02-18HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 5-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenateRead third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
2020-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB384S3
2020-02-07SenateTitle replaced 20107871D-S3
2020-02-07SenateSubstitute by Senator McPike agreed to (24-Y 13-N)
2020-02-07SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-07SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20107714D-S2
2020-02-07SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20106308D-S1
2020-02-07SenateRead second time
2020-02-07SenateFloor substitute printed 20107871D-S3 (McPike)
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107714D-S2
2020-02-05SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N)
2020-01-29SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106308D-S1
2020-01-29SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateAssigned GL&T sub: Gaming
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102548D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182334.3(n/a)See Bill Text
223711(n/a)See Bill Text
372304(n/a)See Bill Text
372314.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5814000(n/a)See Bill Text
5814002(n/a)See Bill Text
5814007(n/a)See Bill Text
5814007.2(n/a)See Bill Text
5814015.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5814027(n/a)See Bill Text
5814030(n/a)See Bill Text
5814048(n/a)See Bill Text
591364(n/a)See Bill Text
591569(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB384&201+sum+SB384
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB384+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB384S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB384S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB384S3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB384H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB384S4+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB384S5+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB384ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0091+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0187+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0382SB0384+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0407SB0384+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0434SB0384+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0390+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1169+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0947SB0384+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1112SB0384+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1805SB0384+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1806SB0384+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2111+SB0384
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1882SB0384+SB0384

Bill Comments

feedback