VA SB384 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Incorporated by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Incorporated by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State health insurance program; participation by certain local school division employees. Provides for the participation by employees of a school division in the state employee health plan. If the local school board elects to participate in the state employee health plan, it must make the election no later than January 1, 2017, with an effective date of July 1, 2017, for an initial period of three consecutive plan years, and thereafter participation shall be renewable for additional three-year terms at the option of the local school board. The bill also provides that the total cost of participation shall be paid by the local school board and the employees of the school division.
Title
State health insurance program; participation by certain local school division employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Finance (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | Incorporated by Finance |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102548D |
Same As/Similar To
SB364 (Similar To) 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)