VA SB382 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local electoral boards; reassigning certain duties related to elections administration. Reassigns duties of the electoral boards related to elections administration to the general registrars. When performing these duties, the general registrars are acting in their capacity as directors of elections.
Title
Local electoral boards; reassigning certain duties related to elections administration.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 492 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB382ER) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103074D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1145 (Same As) 2016-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 115.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 527 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 604.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 614 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 616 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 627 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 631 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 639 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 641 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 642 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 647 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 659 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 668 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 683 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 684 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |