VA SB381 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Election day program; permitted activities of participants. Allows election pages participating in the election day program for high school students to assist in the arrangement of voting equipment, furniture, and any other materials for the conduct of the election. The bill also allows election pages to assist in the counting of unmarked ballots prior to the opening of the polls, at the direction and under the direct supervision of the chief officer of election, but prohibits election pages from handling or touching ballots in any other circumstance. Currently, participants in the election day program are prohibited from handling or touching ballots, voting machines, and other official election materials. The bill requires the election pages to receive, from a person designated by the electoral board, training on the duties, responsibilities, and prohibited conduct of election pages.
Title
Election day program; permitted activities of participants.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 491 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB381ER) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103090D |
Same As/Similar To
HB205 (Same As) 2016-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)