VA SB378 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0855)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Coal tax credits. Reinstates the Coalfield employment enhancement tax credit. The credit, which expired on July 1, 2016, can be earned on and after January 1, 2018, but before January 1, 2023, and only for metallurgical coal. This bill is identical to HB 665.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coalfield employment enhancement tax credit; metallurgical coal mined by underground methods.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (13-Y 26-N) (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 27-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0855)
2018-05-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 855 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18SenateCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (13-Y 26-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 27-N 1-A)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
2018-03-08SenateSigned by President
2018-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB378ER)
2018-03-05SenateEnrolled
2018-02-28SenateTitle replaced 18107778D-H1
2018-02-28SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N)
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 41-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed House with substitute (58-Y 41-N)
2018-02-28HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute SB378H1
2018-02-28HouseSubstitute by Delegate Kilgore agreed to 18107778D-H1
2018-02-28HouseCommittee amendments rejected
2018-02-28HouseRead third time
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseTaken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27HouseFloor substitute reprinted 18107778D-H1 (Kilgore)
2018-02-27HouseRead second time
2018-02-27HouseFloor substitute printed 18107778D-H1 (Kilgore)
2018-02-26HouseReported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 8-N)
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
2018-02-02SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31SenateReported from Finance (13-Y 3-N)
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104621D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581433.1(n/a)See Bill Text
581439.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB378
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB378+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB378H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB378ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0855+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0112+SB0378
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0249SB0378+SB0378
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0280SB0378+SB0378
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0133+SB0378
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1089+SB0378
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1104+SB0378
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0768SB0378+SB0378
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1230SB0378+SB0378
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1232SB0378+SB0378
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1233SB0378+SB0378

Bill Comments

feedback