VA SB375 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0620)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sunday hunting; exceptions; raccoons. Removes the prohibition on hunting or killing raccoons after 2:00 a.m. on Sunday. This bill is identical to HB 239.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting with the assistance of dogs; hunting or killing raccoons on Sunday.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0620)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 620 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB375ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06SenateReconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N)
2018-03-06SenateTitle replaced 18105929D-H1
2018-03-06SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
2018-03-05HousePassed House with substitute (88-Y 11-N)
2018-03-05HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB375H1
2018-03-05HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105929D-H1
2018-03-05HouseRead third time
2018-03-02HouseRead second time
2018-02-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105929D-H1
2018-02-28HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2018-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-01-29HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB375S1
2018-01-23SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18105034D-S1
2018-01-23SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-23SenateRead second time
2018-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 18105034D-S1
2018-01-18SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102231D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291521(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB375
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB375+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB375S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB375H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB375ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0620+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S01V0029+SB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0089SB0375+SB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0110SB0375+SB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H01V0134+SB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1274+SB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0950SB0375+SB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0951SB0375+SB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0952SB0375+SB0375

Bill Comments

feedback