VA SB369 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public health emergency; out-of-state licenses; deemed licensure. Allows a practitioner of a profession regulated by the Board of Medicine who is licensed in another state or the District of Columbia and who is in good standing with the applicable regulatory agency in that state or the District of Columbia to engage in the practice of that profession in the Commonwealth with a patient located in the Commonwealth when (i) such practice is for the purpose of providing continuity of care through the use of telemedicine services and (ii) the patient is a current patient of the practitioner with whom the practitioner has previously established a practitioner-patient relationship and the practitioner has performed an in-person examination of the patient within the previous 12 months. The bill also provides that when the Board of Health has issued an emergency order, the Boards of Medicine and Nursing may waive (a) the requirement for submission of a fee for renewal or reinstatement of a license to practice medicine or osteopathic medicine or as a physician assistant or nurse practitioner and (b) the requirement for submission of evidence that a practitioner whose license was allowed to lapse for failure to meet professional activity requirements has satisfied such requirements and is prepared to resume practice in a competent manner for any person who held a valid, unrestricted, active license within the four-year period immediately prior to the application for renewal or reinstatement of such license.
Title
Public health emergency; out-of-state licenses, deemed licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 720 (effective 4/27/22) |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB369ER2) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB369ER) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Title replaced 22106838D-H1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB369H1 |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106838D-H1 |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106838D-H1 |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22100169D-E |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB369E |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100169D |
Same As/Similar To
HB264 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
HB264 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
HB264 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)