VA SB360 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Superintendent of Public Instruction; teacher exit questionnaire. Requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to develop and provide to local school divisions a model exit questionnaire for teachers.
Title
Teachers; Superintendent of Public Instruction to provide a model exit questionnaire.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 594 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB360ER) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-07 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed House with amendment (94-Y 4-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-22 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101735D |