VA SB357 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Management of the menhaden fishery. Directs the Virginia Marine Resources Commission to adopt regulations to implement the Interstate Fishery Management Plan for Atlantic Menhaden and requires that any moratorium on the fishery be subject to legislative review.
Title
Menhaden; management of fishery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned ACNR sub: Menhaden |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101317D |
Same As/Similar To
SB791 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1000.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 203.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |