VA SB352 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Official emblems and designations. Designates Nelsonite as the state rock of Virginia. The bill also adds to § 1-510, which consolidates official state emblems and designations, two designations
Title
Nelsonite; designating as state rock, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 675 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB352ER) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendment (92-Y 4-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB352S1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Deeds agreed to 16104801D-S1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 16104801D-S1 (Deeds) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101518D |