VA SB350 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Concealed handgun permit; expiration date. Extends from five to 15 years the validity of a concealed handgun permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed handgun permit; extends expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Finance
2018-02-07SenateContinued to 2019 in Finance (13-Y 2-N)
2018-01-17SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-01-17SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100516D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.010(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.02(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.04(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.05(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.06(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback