VA SB349 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reemployment rights of members of Virginia National Guard, Virginia State Defense Force, or naval militia. Extends the period in which a member of the Virginia National Guard, Virginia State Defense Force, or naval militia is required to apply for reinstatement in his former job to 90 days following his release from duty or from hospitalization following release, if the length of the member's absence by reason of service in the uniformed services exceeds 180 days. If the duration of his absence does not exceed 180 days, such notice must be given within 14 days, which is the current period allowed in all instances regardless of the duration of the absence. This notice period is consistent with that provided under the federal Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act for service members deployed for 181 days or longer.
Title
Virginia National Guard, State Defense Force, or naval militia; reemployment rights of members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 253 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB349ER) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100116D |