VA SB340 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Overgrown vegetation; local authority. Authorizes any locality within Planning District 23 or that has a population of at least 75,000 to include provisions for cutting overgrown shrubs, trees, and other such vegetation in an ordinance requiring certain landowners to cut the grass, weeds, and other foreign growth on certain property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Overgrown vegetation; local authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional readings dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
2020-01-15SenatePrinted as engrossed 20102412D-E
2020-01-15SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB340E
2020-01-15SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-15SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-15SenateRead second time
2020-01-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13SenateReported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 1-N)
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102412D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152901(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback