VA SB331 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Law-enforcement officers retirement; early retirement. Requires that all employers electing to provide benefits equivalent to the State Police Officers' Retirement System for employees in hazardous duty positions consider employees eligible for full retirement after reaching the age of 50 and completing 25 years of service, for employees retiring on or after July 1, 2012. Under current law, certain employers could elect to provide for full retirement after employees complete 30 years of service.
Title
Law enforcement officers; early retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100608D |