VA SB331 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-30 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB330-Quayle) (13-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-30 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB330-Quayle) (13-Y 0-N)
Summary
Admissibility of mental health care records in custody and visitation cases. Repeals the current law, which provides that in any case in which custody or visitation of a child is at issue, the mental health records concerning a parent shall be privileged and confidential and the mental health care provider may not be required to testify on behalf of or against a parent or any of the parent's adult relatives. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Custody and visitation cases; admissibility of mental health care records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-30 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB330-Quayle) (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-10 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081527216 |
Same As/Similar To
SB330 (Similar To) 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB331 |