VA SB319 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
General contractors; waiver or diminishment of lien rights; subordination of lien rights. Provides that a general contractor may not waive or diminish his lien rights in a contract in advance of furnishing any labor, services, or materials. The bill further provides that, notwithstanding the prohibition against waiving or diminishing such a lien right, a general contractor may, prior to or after providing any labor, services, or materials, contract to subordinate his lien rights to prior and later recorded deeds of trust, provided that such contract is (i) in writing and (ii) signed by any general contractor whose lien rights are being subordinated pursuant to such contract. This bill is identical to HB 823.
Title
Contractors, general; waiver or diminishment of lien rights, subordination of lien rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 79 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB319ER) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103061D |