VA SB319 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; primary elections; date of June primary elections. Changes the date of primary elections held in the month of June from the second Tuesday in June to the third Tuesday in June and changes candidate filing deadlines to reflect that change of date.
Title
Elections; primary elections, date of June primary elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103323D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 515.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |