VA SB313 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Summary
Child support; exemption; parents who are imprisoned for life. Clarifies that only parents who are imprisoned for life with no chance of parole are exempted from paying the presumptive minimum child support obligation of $65 per month. Currently, all parents who are imprisoned with no chance of parole are exempted.
Title
Child support; exemption for parents who are imprisoned for life.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 697 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB313ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-10 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084465820 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB313 |