VA SB310 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Senate districts; adjustments. Changes district assignments of certain census blocks in Districts 13, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 22, 23, and 33 in Bedford, Brunswick, Dinwiddie, Halifax, and Loudoun Counties and changes district assignments of two precincts between Districts 17 and 22 in Louisa County. The district population deviations remain at two percent or less from the ideal district population.
Title
Senate districts; technical adjustments of certain boundaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 31-N) (Y: 71 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (19-Y 18-N) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 31-N) (Y: 71 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (19-Y 18-N) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (19-Y 20-N) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB310ER) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 31-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House (69-Y 31-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Appointments |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (19-Y 18-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB310S1 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14103996D-S1 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Incorporates SB436 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Incorporates SB344 |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14103996D-S1 |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102758D |
Same As/Similar To
SB344 (Similar To) 2014-01-14 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
SB436 (Similar To) 2014-01-14 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
SB436 (Similar To) 2014-01-14 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections