VA SB31 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Eminent domain; costs for petition for distribution of funds; interest rate; recordation of certificate. Provides that the costs of filing a petition with the court for the distribution of the funds due pursuant to an eminent domain proceeding shall be taxed against the condemnor. The bill also provides that the interest rate on the funds represented by a certificate of deposit from the date of filing of the certificate until the funds are paid into the court shall not be less than the judgment rate of interest. Finally, the bill reorganizes for clarity the provisions governing what happens upon recordation of a certificate by the Commissioner of Highways in a condemnation proceeding. The bill provides that its provisions apply only to condemnation actions filed on or after July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent domain; costs for petition for distribution of funds, interest rate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB31ER)
2020-03-07SenateEnrolled
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed by temporarily
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseReported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2020-02-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-21HouseRead first time
2020-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20100604D-E
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB31E
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateReported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100604D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251310(n/a)See Bill Text
3321021(n/a)See Bill Text
3321023(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB31&201+sum+SB31
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB31+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB31E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB31ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0124+SB0031
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0278+SB0031
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0031+SB0031
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0031+SB0031
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0031+SB0031
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0031+SB0031
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0031+SB0031
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0802V0111+SB0031
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0395+SB0031
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1894+SB0031

Bill Comments

feedback