VA SB309 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration applications; retention of information on applicant's last previous residence. Provides that the general registrar for the locality where a voter currently resides shall retain the portion of the application that shows the applicant's last previous place of registration, or a copy thereof, if the voter formerly resided in another state. The general registrar shall send the original or a copy to the appropriate registration official of the other state where the applicant formerly resided.
Title
Voter changes of address; retention of copies by general registrar.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (88-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 795 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB309ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (88-Y 7-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (88-Y 7-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB309ER) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Passed House (87-Y 11-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #3 Campaign Finance | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB309S1 | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104374D-S1 | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104374D-S1 | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 4-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100890D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 418 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 424 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 428 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |