VA SB306 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB306

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Destruction of criminal history information for certain charges and convictions. Provides that a court shall enter an order of destruction for police and court records, in the absence of good cause shown to the contrary by the Commonwealth, for a deferred disposition dismissal of (i) underage alcohol possession when one year has passed since the date of dismissal and all court costs and fines and all orders of restitution have been satisfied or (ii) possession of marijuana when three years have passed since the date of dismissal and all court costs and fines and all orders of restitution have been satisfied. The bill also provides that any person who has received such deferred disposition dismissals may file a petition with the court that disposed of such charge for an order of destruction at any time provided that all court costs and fines and all orders of restitution have been satisfied. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal history information; destruction of information for certain charges and convictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-18HouseReferred from General Laws by voice vote
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20106744D-ES1
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB306ES1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106744D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-03SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106744D-S1
2020-01-20SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100961D

Same As/Similar To

SB287 (Similar To)
SB306 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16169.55(n/a)See Bill Text
182251(n/a)See Bill Text
41305(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB306
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB306+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB306S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB306ES1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB306AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB306F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB306FES1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03C0158+SB0306
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05C0210+SB0306
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0457SB0306+SB0306
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0520SB0306+SB0306
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0521SB0306+SB0306
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0522SB0306+SB0306
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0523SB0306+SB0306

Bill Comments

feedback