VA SB302 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Guardianship; petitions; appointment. Clarifies that a community services board and any other local or state governmental agency may file a petition for the appointment of a guardian or conservator of an incapacitated person. The bill also specifies that a guardian need not be appointed for the purposes of making a health care decision when such decision is made pursuant to and within the scope of the Health Care Decisions Act. Finally, the bill requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to convene a work group to consider issues related to (i) the care of adults with permanent disabilities that render them incapable of making informed decisions about their own care and (ii) potential changes to guardianship requirements to make it easier for parents to care for their adult children with such disabilities. Guardianship; petitions; appointment. Clarifies that a community services board and any other local or state governmental agency may file a petition for the appointment of a guardian or conservator of an incapacitated person. The bill also specifies that a guardian need not be appointed for the purposes of making a health care decision when such decision is made pursuant to and within the scope of the Health Care Decisions Act. Finally, the bill requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to convene a work group to consider issues related to (i) the care of adults with permanent disabilities that render them incapable of making informed decisions about their own care and (ii) potential changes to guardianship requirements to make it easier for parents to care for their adult children with such disabilities.
Title
Guardians; appointment, petitions for guardianship, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 630 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB302ER) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Bell, Campbell, J.L., Hope |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Edwards, Deeds, Stanley |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-09 | House | House insisted on amendments |
2022-03-08 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB302S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106467D-S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106467D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100252D |