VA SB285 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Bail appeal; presumption against bail. Requires a district court to stay the imposition of its order granting bail in cases where there was a presumption against bail if the court receives notice that the Commonwealth is going to appeal the court's decision to the circuit court. The stay is limited to five days but can be waived if the defendant requests a hearing outside the five days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bail appeal; presumption against bail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-01 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
2016-04-01 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 621 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
2016-03-10SenateSigned by President
2016-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-10SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB285ER)
2016-03-10SenateEnrolled
2016-03-08SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2016-03-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2016-03-07HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTES (96-Y 0-N)
2016-03-07HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2016-03-07HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2016-03-07HouseRead third time
2016-03-07HousePassed by temporarily
2016-03-07HouseRead third time
2016-03-04HouseRead second time
2016-03-02HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2016-02-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
2016-02-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2016-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2016-02-05HouseRead first time
2016-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
2016-02-01SenatePrinted as engrossed 16101987D-E
2016-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB285E
2016-02-01SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2016-02-01SenateReading of amendments waived
2016-02-01SenateRead second time
2016-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2016-01-27SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 4-N)
2016-01-07SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2016-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101987D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192124(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+SB285
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB285+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB285E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB285ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0621+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S03V0081+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S03V0136+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0135SB0285+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0166SB0285+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0801V0269+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H08V0419+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1205+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0915SB0285+SB0285

Bill Comments 750

feedback