VA SB285 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0177)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil penalty; untaxed tobacco products. Creates a civil penalty for the import, transport, possession, or resale of untaxed tobacco products and delineates the respective penalty for first, second, and third or subsequent offenses. The bill also specifies a civil penalty for willful intent to defraud the Commonwealth of taxes levied on tobacco products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil penalty; untaxed tobacco products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0177)
2014-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 177 (effective 7/1/14)
2014-02-23SenateSigned by President
2014-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2014-02-21SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB285ER)
2014-02-21SenateEnrolled
2014-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
2014-02-19HousePassed House (95-Y 2-N)
2014-02-19HouseRead third time
2014-02-18HouseRead second time
2014-02-17HouseReported from Finance (20-Y 1-N)
2014-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2014-02-07HouseRead first time
2014-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N)
2014-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB285S1
2014-02-03SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 14104577D-S1
2014-02-03SenateReading of substitute waived
2014-02-03SenateRead second time
2014-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2014-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 14104577D-S1
2014-01-29SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
2014-01-14SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2014-01-14SenateRereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N)
2014-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2014-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101320D

Same As/Similar To

HB898 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0038)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5811021.04:3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+SB285
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+SB285+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+SB285S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+SB285ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+CHAP0177+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+S05V0006+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+S03V0117+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0231SB0285+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0262SB0285+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+H10V0191+SB0285
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+HV0779+SB0285

Bill Comments 750

feedback