VA SB283 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0136)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Crab pots; recreational gear license; turtle excluder device. Directs the Virginia Marine Resources Commission to charge recreational gear license fees of $36 for crab pots with turtle excluder devices and $46 for crab pots without such devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crab pots; recreational gear license, turtle excluder device.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-22 - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-01 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0136)
2016-03-01 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 136 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016
2016-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16
2016-02-25SenateSigned by President
2016-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB283ER)
2016-02-24SenateEnrolled
2016-02-22SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2016-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2016-02-19HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2016-02-19HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2016-02-19HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2016-02-19HouseRead third time
2016-02-18HouseRead second time
2016-02-17HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2016-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
2016-02-08HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2016-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2016-02-05HouseRead first time
2016-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2016-02-02SenateRead second time and engrossed
2016-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2016-01-28SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2016-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2016-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102014D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282226.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?161+sum+SB283
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?161+ful+SB283+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?161+ful+SB283ER+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?161+ful+CHAP0136+hil
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?161+vot+S01V0027+SB0283
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?161+vot+SV0152SB0283+SB0283
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?161+vot+SV0178SB0283+SB0283
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?161+vot+H0103V0023+SB0283
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?161+vot+H01V0088+SB0283
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?161+vot+HV0709+SB0283
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?161+vot+SV0520SB0283+SB0283

Bill Comments

feedback