VA SB278 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal history background checks; continued employment of individuals convicted of an offense. Prohibits assisted living facilities, adult day care centers, licensed and registered child welfare agencies, and family day homes approved by family day systems from continuing to employ individuals who have been convicted of specific offenses as defined in § 63.2-1719 that are barriers to employment.
Title
Child welfare agencies; background checks for volunteers and employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 632 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-08 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB278ER) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Title replaced 16105823D-H1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB278H1 |
2016-02-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105823D-H1 |
2016-02-29 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105823D-H1 |
2016-02-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 16102454D |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102454D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 1720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1720.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1721 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1721.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |