VA SB276 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Energy upgrade programs; Phase I and Phase II Utilities; State Corporation Commission to study feasibility; work group; report. Directs the State Corporation Commission to convene a work group to study the feasibility of the implementation of an energy upgrade program for eligible customers opting to participate by each Phase I and Phase II Utility, which program would permit such utility to (i) install one or more energy projects, as defined in the bill, at a participant's location and (ii) collect a special rate, as defined in the bill, to repay the costs of such installation. The bill requires the Commission to report the findings and recommendations of the work group to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Labor and Commerce, the Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor, and the Commission on Electric Utility Regulation by January 1, 2025. Energy upgrade programs; Phase I and Phase II Utilities; State Corporation Commission to study feasibility; work group; report. Directs the State Corporation Commission to convene a work group to study the feasibility of the implementation of an energy upgrade program for eligible customers opting to participate by each Phase I and Phase II Utility, which program would permit such utility to (i) install one or more energy projects, as defined in the bill, at a participant's location and (ii) collect a special rate, as defined in the bill, to repay the costs of such installation. The bill requires the Commission to report the findings and recommendations of the work group to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Labor and Commerce, the Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor, and the Commission on Electric Utility Regulation by January 1, 2025.
Title
Phase I and Phase II Utilities; SCC to study feasibility of an energy upgrade program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 4-N) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 4-N) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB276ER) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed House with amendments (52-Y 46-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Rules (13-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB276S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106373D-S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106373D-S1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104918D |
Subjects
Public Service Companies
State Corporation Commission
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
State Corporation Commission
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation