VA SB275 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

School enrollment; students formerly in foster care. Provides for the immediate enrollment of any student who was in foster care upon reaching 18 years of age but who has not yet reached 22 years of age for whom the local department of social services or child-placing agency is unable to produce documents normally required for enrollment. Under current law, an exception to the requirement for such documentation is provided only to students currently in foster care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School enrollment; students formerly in foster care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB275S1
2020-01-13SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20105415D-S1
2020-01-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-13SenateRead second time
2020-01-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-09SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105415D-S1
2020-01-09SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101876D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2213.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback