VA SB273 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Synthetic cannabinoids; bath salts; penalties. Amends provisions added to the Code last year regarding the criminalization of synthetic cannabinoids and chemicals known as "bath salts" to add newly identified chemical combinations. The bill adds a more generic chemical description of synthetic cannabinoids so that new chemical compounds will nevertheless be considered synthetic cannabinoids without the precise chemical compound having to be added to the Code.
Title
Cannabinoids, synthetic; amends provisions regarding criminalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 816 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB273ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB273ER) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2012-02-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB273S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104555D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Incorporates SB223 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104555D-S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103641D |
Same As/Similar To
SB223 (Similar To) 2012-01-23 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB508 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
HB508 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 248.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3446 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |