VA SB273 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Summary
Emergency custody orders, temporary detention orders, and involuntary admissions. Eliminates the requirement that an individual pose an imminent danger to himself or others; adds a requirement that handcuffs or other restraints may be used during transportation only if the person is deemed to be a danger to himself or others; and adds a requirement that the testimony of family members, friends, treating or examining physicians, or other individuals with a knowledge of the person's mental or emotional state be considered prior to the ordering of an emergency custody order, temporary detention order, or order for involuntary admission. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Emergency custody orders, temporary detention orders, etc.; eliminates & adds requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-28 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084317220 |
Same As/Similar To
SB246 (Similar To) 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0870)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB273 |