VA SB271 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Center for School Safety; antibullying training. Requires the Virginia Center for School Safety to provide training on antibullying tactics to public school personnel.
Title
Virginia Center for School Safety; provide training to public school personnel on antibullying.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281) | |
2012-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 281 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB271ER) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-22 | House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-20 | House: Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB271S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104370D-S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104370D-S1 | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) | |
2012-01-13 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103524D |
Same As/Similar To
HB504 (Same As) 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)