VA SB269 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Patient notice of observation or outpatient status. Provides that, for Medicare patients placed in observation or outpatient status, any hospital that provides a written notice and an oral explanation of such notice to the patient that satisfies the federal requirements for such notice shall be deemed to have satisfied Virginia's requirements for such notice. The bill also extends the timeframe for the provision of the notice required by current law from 24 hours to 36 hours. This bill incorporates SB 281.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicare patients; patient notice of observation or outpatient status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
2018-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 194 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
2018-02-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
2018-02-23SenateSigned by President
2018-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB269ER)
2018-02-22SenateEnrolled
2018-02-20HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HousePassed House (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HouseRead third time
2018-02-19HouseRead second time
2018-02-15HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N)
2018-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-01-18HouseRead first time
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-16SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2018-01-16SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB269S1
2018-01-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18104911D-S1
2018-01-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-15SenateRead second time
2018-01-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-11SenateIncorporates SB281 (Barker)
2018-01-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 18104911D-S1
2018-01-11SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100970D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321137.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB269
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB269+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB269S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB269ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0194+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0009+SB0269
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0015SB0269+SB0269
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0038SB0269+SB0269
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0040SB0269+SB0269
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0041SB0269+SB0269
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H12V0182+SB0269
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0877+SB0269

Bill Comments

feedback