VA SB268 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Title replaced 20108161D-H1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Sales tax exemption; gun safes. Establishes an exemption from retail sales tax for a gun safe with a selling price of $1,000 or less. The bill defines a gun safe as a safe or vault that is (i) commercially available, (ii) secured with a digital or dial combination locking mechanism or biometric locking mechanism, and (iii) designed for the storage of a firearm or of ammunition for use in a firearm. Under the bill, a gun safe does not include a glass-faced cabinet. The bill sunsets on July 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption for certain gun safes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (31-Y 6-N) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateTitle replaced 20108161D-H1
2020-02-19SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (31-Y 6-N)
2020-02-17HouseVOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N)
2020-02-17HousePassed House with substitute (99-Y 1-N)
2020-02-17HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB268H1
2020-02-17HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108161D-H1
2020-02-17HouseRead third time
2020-02-14HouseRead second time
2020-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108161D-H1
2020-02-12HouseReported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-02-12HouseRead first time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23SenatePrinted as engrossed 20102386D-E
2020-01-23SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB268E
2020-01-23SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-23SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-23SenateRead second time
2020-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102386D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581609.10(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback